Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 469 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18272 Week
» 71288 Month
» 190815 Year
» 3217668 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8009 |
08/10/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20009 |
02/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
08/10/1957 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
12/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/10/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1975 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/10/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8009 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20009 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
19/07/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20009 |
|
|
18/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|