Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 559 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6343 Week
» 27732 Month
» 147259 Year
» 3174112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8007 |
19/09/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20007 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
19/09/1957 to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
Withdrawn |
01/07/1993 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
19/09/1957 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/09/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/09/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8007 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
24/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20007 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
01/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20007 |
|
|