|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derby Works | 02/05/1956 | 24/05/1956 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 14/10/1958 | 03/12/1958 | 51 days | Heavy General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1960 | 03/09/1960 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/06/1962 | 07/07/1962 | 29 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/10/1958 | Derby Works (Stripping) | 17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/03/1953 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 80060 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Bedford (15D) |
||
29/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury (26D) | ||
25/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
02/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1956. Dep: 24/05/1956. | ||
14/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/10/1958. Dep: 03/12/1958. | ||
29/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stirling (63B) | ||
08/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1960. Dep: 03/09/1960. | ||
09/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1962. Dep: 07/07/1962. | ||
31/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
03/08/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) | ||
13/12/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
07/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 80060 | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |