|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derby Works | 10/05/1955 | 02/06/1955 | 24 days | Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 17/02/1958 | 08/04/1958 | 51 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 31/08/1960 | 24/09/1960 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 10/01/1962 | 03/02/1962 | 25 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 23/01/1963 | 16/02/1963 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
20/01/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Works yard) | In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/05/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 80035 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Watford (1C) |
||
10/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/05/1955. Dep: 02/06/1955. | ||
17/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1958. Dep: 08/04/1958. | ||
31/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (73F) | ||
31/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 31/08/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960. | ||
10/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1962. Dep: 03/02/1962. | ||
28/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
23/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1963. Dep: 16/02/1963. | ||
12/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E) | ||
10/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D) | ||
21/02/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E) | ||
21/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 80035 from Yeovil Town (83E) | ||
07/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Birds: Bynea |