Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 723 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18526 Week
» 71542 Month
» 191069 Year
» 3217922 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8003 |
23/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20003 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
23/08/1957 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/08/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8003 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20003 |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
16/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20003 |
|
|
16/08/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Swindon Works (ZL) |
|
|
04/02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|