Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1520 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7304 Week
» 28693 Month
» 148220 Year
» 3175073 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8000 |
18/06/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20050 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
Cost when Built |
£58,391.00 |
To Service |
18/06/1957 to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
Withdrawn |
14/12/1980 off Toton (TO) |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
18/06/1957 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/06/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8000 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
05/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Toton (18A) |
|
|
20/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Toton (18A) |
|
|
20/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) (Paper - contd at Toton) |
|
|
27/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
24/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20050 |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
14/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20050 from Toton (TO) |
|
|