|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/10/1963 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Triangle: 3653, 4507, 4690, 9645. Yard: D829/50/69, D1056, 3652/68, 3766/9, 4082, 4113/76, 5093, 6000/11/25/26, 6763 6819/58/61, 6922/23/61, 7803/08, 8738, 9412/40, 9633, 9700/99. 'A' Shop: D833/4/45/61, D1000/1/7/25/6/8/36/40/54/63/7, D3102, D3510/1/2/9, D3599/604/809, D7039, 4121/50/61, 6116, 6820/35, 6864/66/72/6, 6947/59/80, 7922, 9605, 9673. Dump: 1471, 1608, 4134, 4629/51, 5201, 5645, 5787, 6416, 6609/31/9/74, 8491, 8791, 9401, 9636, 9764. | SLS/196312 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/09/1950 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7922 Built at Swindon Works |
||
17/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
31/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) | ||
21/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
06/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
08/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) | ||
15/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southall (81C) | ||
08/08/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
31/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7922 | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |