Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3407 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16813 Week
» 69829 Month
» 189356 Year
» 3216209 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78056 |
m/e |
08/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
w/e |
11/08/1956 |
ALLOC |
6K |
Rhyl |
5w/e |
02/05/1959 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
5w/e |
05/05/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78056 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
28/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78056 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|