Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1128 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18931 Week
» 71947 Month
» 191474 Year
» 3218327 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78049 |
m/e |
11/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
64A |
St Margarets |
on |
02/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
64G |
Hawick |
4w/e |
04/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
05/02/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/08/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78049 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
22/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78049 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|