Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1049 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18852 Week
» 71868 Month
» 191395 Year
» 3218248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7717 |
m/e |
05/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Kerr Stuart |
Order Number |
279 |
Works Number |
4452 |
To Service |
During 05/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/03/1960 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1930 |
MTHR |
|
Merthyr Tydfil |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88A |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
88C |
|
Barry |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/03/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7717 Built at Kerr Stuart, Works Number 4452 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Merthyr Tydfil (MTHR) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
07/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7717 |
|
|
05/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|