Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 529 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6313 Week
» 27702 Month
» 147229 Year
» 3174082 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7671 |
25/02/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25321 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
25/02/1967 to London Division (D01) |
Withdrawn |
29/09/1986 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
25/02/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/02/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
07/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/02/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7671 Built at Derby Works Allocated to London Division (D01) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25321 |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
29/09/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25321 |
|
|