Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1456 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19259 Week
» 72275 Month
» 191802 Year
» 3218655 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7659 |
21/07/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25309 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (25/9) |
25909 |
11/12/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/07/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/07/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/07/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7659 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25309 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25909 |
|
|
01/09/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25909 |
|
|