Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2274 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20077 Week
» 73093 Month
» 192620 Year
» 3219473 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7627 |
12/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25277 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/08/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
03/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
02/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7627 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 8037 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25277 |
|
|
15/04/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25277 |
|
|
26/10/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|