Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1716 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15122 Week
» 68138 Month
» 187665 Year
» 3214518 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7615 |
12/06/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25265 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
12/06/1966 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
18/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/06/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
05/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
08/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
05/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7615 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
17/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
12/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25265 |
|
|
05/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
18/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
18/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25265 |
|
|