Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2194 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19997 Week
» 73013 Month
» 192540 Year
» 3219393 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7614 |
07/06/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25264 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
07/06/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
23/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/06/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
23/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/06/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7614 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25264 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25264 |
|
|
05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|