Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1565 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7349 Week
» 28738 Month
» 148265 Year
» 3175118 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7612 |
23/04/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25262 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (25/9) |
25901 |
20/12/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
23/04/1966 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/04/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
05/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1977 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/04/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
06/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7612 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25262 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
20/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25901 |
|
|
01/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25901 |
|
|