Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 735 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5929 Week
» 12980 Month
» 235381 Year
» 1119762 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76104 m/e 07/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 07/1957 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Mon 01/05/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Campbells (Airdrie)
Service Life 9 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) m/e 07/1957
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
64F Bathgate 4w/e 28/11/1964
66A Polmadie 5w/e 29/01/1966
   Withdrawn 01/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 67A Corkerhill 06/07/1957
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 5w/e 12/12/1964
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   01/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 76104
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
20/07/1959 Sightings Passed through Craigellachie with the 9:40am ex Elgin BackTrack Jan 2007  
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76104    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev