Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1567 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19370 Week
» 72386 Month
» 191913 Year
» 3218766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76100 |
on |
30/05/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
65D |
Dawsholm |
on |
30/05/1957 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
30/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
6w/e |
07/11/1964 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
3w/e |
30/10/1965 |
ALLOC |
66F |
Beattock |
5w/e |
08/01/1966 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
5w/e |
11/06/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/08/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/05/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76100 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
10/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
24/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
18/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
13/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Beattock (66F) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
17/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76100 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by West of Scotland Shipbreaking: Troon |
|
|