Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 165 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 2026 Week
» 23008 Month
» 164962 Year
» 1049343 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76098 m/e 10/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1957 to Corkerhill (67A)
Withdrawal During 05/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at T W Ward (Inverkeithing)
Service Life 9 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
67A Corkerhill (New) m/e 10/1957
67D Ardrossan 5w/e 30/05/1964
67C Ayr 4w/e 27/02/1965
66F Beattock 4w/e 25/12/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 67A Corkerhill 17/10/1957
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 09/05/1964
ALLOC 67C Ayr 3w/e 06/03/1965
ALLOC 66F Beattock 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   01/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 76098
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Corkerhill (67A)
   
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
27/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Beattock (66F)    
05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76098    
27/01/1968 Sightings Eastfield depot: Stored - Former stationary boiler here. RO 3/1968 Link
03/1968 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Inverkeithing    

prev prev