Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3999 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17405 Week
» 70421 Month
» 189948 Year
» 3216801 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76089 |
on |
25/05/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76089 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (17F) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76089 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|