|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/10/1967 | United Waggon Co., Newport (Mon.) | Dumped locomotives: 34005, 34008, 34009, 34017, 34026, 34032, 34047, 34057, 34088, 34098, 34104, 34108, 48249, 48509, 73002, 73016, 76039, 76058, 76063, 76088, 78063, 82003, 82031, 82034. | SLS/196712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/05/1957 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 76088 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (17F) |
||
10/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
10/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
22/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
21/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
12/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (2E) | ||
27/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (2F) | ||
26/03/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
25/02/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
10/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 76088 | ||
12/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |