Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1267 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 9008 Week
» 29450 Month
» 366296 Year
» 1587861 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 76085 m/e 04/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 04/1957 to Leicester Midland (15C)
Withdrawal During 06/1966
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 9 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15C Leicester Midland (New) m/e 04/1957
21A Saltley 4w/e 10/08/1957
9F Heaton Mersey w/e 10/01/1959
14A Cricklewood East w/e 22/09/1962
5D Stoke w/e 28/09/1963
2E Saltley w/e 12/10/1963
5D Stoke w/e 23/01/1965
16B Colwick w/e 12/03/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15C Leicester Midland w/e 13/04/1957
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 5w/e 06/10/1962
LOAN 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 2E Saltley 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 5D Stoke 3w/e 06/02/1965
LOAN 16B Colwick 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 4w/e 09/04/1966
WDN   w/e 23/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/12/1960 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 76085
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Leicester Midland (15C)
   
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 76085    

prev prev