Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 1255 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8996 Week
» 29438 Month
» 366284 Year
» 1587849 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 76083 m/e 03/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 03/1957 to Lower Darwen (24D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/10/1966
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 9 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24D Lower Darwen (New) m/e 03/1957
8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 13/03/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 22/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 24D Lower Darwen w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 5w/e 13/03/1965
WDN   w/e 22/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/03/1961 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D3925, 40146, 42723/79, 42890, 43880, 44126, 44455, 44512/44, 48118/64, 48507, 48608, 48742/56, 51229, 51441/96, 52270, 52415. Scrap Yard: 50746, 52201/44, 52355. Erecting Shop: D3932-6, D4011/2, 12004/5/46, 42822/4/67/70, 42959/69/75/84, 43000/19, 44099, 44113/97, 44446, 44595, 48056, 48113, 48332, 48454, 48513, 48640/76, 48708, 76077/83, Car Shop: uM28306/81M, uM28586M. Paint Shop: 13247, uM28330M, and the usual preserved engines; Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196105

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 76083
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Lower Darwen (24D)
   
13/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
22/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 76083    

prev prev