Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 995 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8002 Week
» 14136 Month
» 242020 Year
» 1463585 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76079 m/e 02/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 02/1957 to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/12/1967 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Service Life 10 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (New) m/e 02/1957
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 02/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 02/02/1957
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/12/1961 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 76079
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D)
   
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
02/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76079 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    

prev prev