Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1241 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19044 Week
» 72060 Month
» 191587 Year
» 3218440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76070 |
on |
27/09/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
7w/e |
29/12/1962 |
ALLOC |
66F |
Beattock |
4w/e |
09/05/1964 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
5w/e |
12/12/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/08/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76070 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Beattock (66F) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
17/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76070 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|