Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 138 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2831 Week
» 23813 Month
» 165767 Year
» 1050148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76067 m/e 08/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 08/1956 to Eastleigh (71A)
Withdrawal During 07/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 10 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
71A Eastleigh (New) m/e 08/1956
72B Salisbury 4w/e 10/03/1960
70F Bournemouth 5w/e 17/04/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 71A Eastleigh 07/08/1956
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 5w/e 17/04/1967
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1956 To Service To service as BR Number 76067
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Eastleigh (71A)
   
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link
17/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76067    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev