Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 138 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2831 Week
» 23813 Month
» 165767 Year
» 1050148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76061 m/e 07/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 07/1955 to Redhill (75B)
Withdrawal During 01/1967
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
75B Redhill (New) m/e 07/1955
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75B Redhill w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 08/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 76061
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Redhill (75B)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link
01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76061    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev