Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 165 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 2026 Week
» 23008 Month
» 164962 Year
» 1049343 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76060 m/e 07/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 07/1955 to Redhill (75B)
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 10 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
75B Redhill (New) m/e 07/1955
72B Salisbury 6w/e 14/06/1959
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 10/03/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75B Redhill w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 72B Salisbury P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   w/e 05/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 76060
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Redhill (75B)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 76060    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    
07/05/1966 Sightings Stored at Alexandra Dock Jct. RO 8/1966  

prev prev