Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 504 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 1369 Week
» 14402 Month
» 236803 Year
» 1121184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76059 m/e 06/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 06/1955 to Redhill (75B)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/09/1966
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
75B Redhill (New) m/e 06/1955
72B Salisbury 6w/e 14/06/1959
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 10/03/1960
70C Guildford 4w/e 27/06/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 25/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75B Redhill w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 72B Salisbury P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 27/06/1966
WDN   w/e 25/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 76059
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Redhill (75B)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
27/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 76059    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev