Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 46 Today
» 788 Yesterday
» 46 Week
» 13079 Month
» 235480 Year
» 1119861 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76051 m/e 08/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 08/1956 to York (North) (50A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/04/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 10 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
50A York (North) (New) m/e 08/1956
51H Kirkby Stephen 4w/e 20/10/1956
24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 30/04/1960
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/02/1962
21D Aston w/e 14/07/1962
5D Stoke w/e 22/12/1962
16B Colwick w/e 05/02/1966
8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 12/11/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 29/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 50A York (North) w/e 31/08/1956
ALLOC 51H Kirkby Stephen 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 12E Kirkby Stephen 01/02/1958
LOAN 12E Kirkby Stephen 01/02/1958
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 21D Aston 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 16B Colwick 4w/e 05/02/1966
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN   w/e 29/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1956 To Service To service as BR Number 76051
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
09/12/1961 Sightings Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (8G)    
04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76051    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev