Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4410 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13984 Week
» 78938 Month
» 281602 Year
» 3308455 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76044 |
m/e |
08/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
on |
19/08/1954 |
LOAN |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
23/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
5w/e |
11/07/1964 |
ALLOC |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5w/e |
12/03/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76044 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76044 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|