Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1405 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19208 Week
» 72224 Month
» 191751 Year
» 3218604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76043 |
on |
10/08/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76043 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
01/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76043 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|