Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 374 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1473 Week
» 7607 Month
» 235491 Year
» 1457056 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76041 m/e 07/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 07/1954 to Neasden (34E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/04/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 12 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
34E Neasden (New) m/e 07/1954
14A Cricklewood East w/e 30/06/1962
1A Willesden w/e 12/12/1964
2B Oxley w/e 02/10/1965
6A Chester (MR) w/e 11/03/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 01/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 34E Neasden 30/07/1954
LOAN 14D Neasden 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 23/02/1958
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 2B Oxley 4w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 01/04/1967
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 08/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/12/1963 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Triangle: 3653, 8425, 9425. Yard: D1060, D7092, 2818, 3668/71/6, 4111, 4555, 4690, 4987, 6000/10/25, 6159, 6831/48/9/50/9/61, 6922, 8738, 9645, 76037/76/81. Dump: 3706, 5201, 5787, 6011, 6151, 6618/31/74, 6724, 8103, 8461/91, 8791, 9401. 'A' Shop: D812/9/24/34/5/45/61, D1006/8/16/26/7/8/9/36/40/3/5/9/65, D3031, D3515/7/97, D3603/6/7, D6328, D7003/12/26/35/58, 4113/76, 5691, 6141/3, 6866, 6976/98, 7808/12/20/6, 7928, 9600/66, 73053/93, 76041, 92003. Ex-Works: 6858. Stored on Shed: 1006/27, 3842, 4631, 4924/96, 5017, 5357, 5814, 5904/43, 9604. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 76041
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Neasden (34E)
   
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
12/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
01/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76041    

prev prev