Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1834 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19637 Week
» 72653 Month
» 192180 Year
» 3219033 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76038 |
on |
01/07/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/07/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76038 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
08/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76038 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|