Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 505 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 1370 Week
» 14403 Month
» 236804 Year
» 1121185 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76025 m/e 10/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 10/1953 to Eastleigh (71A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 31/10/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 12 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
71A Eastleigh (New) m/e 10/1953
71B Bournemouth 3w/e 26/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 31/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 31/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1953 To Service To service as BR Number 76025
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Eastleigh (71A)
   
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
31/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 76025    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev