Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1594 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15000 Week
» 68016 Month
» 187543 Year
» 3214396 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76020 |
on |
18/12/1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/12/1952 |
North Eastern Miscellany |
Darlington: No. 76020 is working from Bank Top Shed, and we hear that 76021/2 are at Hull. No. 76023 worked an up goods arriving Darlington 2.30 p.m. and returned north at 4 p.m. on 12th January. It is proposed to try 76020 on a two-trip Saltburn passenger job when run in. Nos. 78001/2 worked the 8.25 p.m. Darlington-Kirkby goods one day (or night!) last week, but both were shy steamers and broke no records climbing Stainmore. The Royal train, last Saturday, was worked by 'A.1' No. 60131 Osprey, and No. 60075 St. Frusquin stood pilot at Bank Top, cleaned up in the old N.E.R. tradition. No. 65103 ('J.21') is running two trips, Darlington-Penrith, daily with the Bank Top passenger turns, quite a nice mileage for this loco., but she is kept in excellent fettle. Another consistent performer here is No. 61353, the Rugby Plant 'B.1.' She is regularly on a Darlington-Newcastle-Leeds-Darlington job, double manned. |
SLS/195303 |
15/04/1962 |
Bolton MPD (Ex Works) |
Ex Works on Bolton (26C) Shed: 42772, 42942, 44346, 44405, 48631, 76020. |
SLS/196205 |
18/08/1962 |
Aston MPD |
B.R. Standard Class 4s 76020/2/3/51 have been transferred here from Springs Branch (replaced there by WDs) and are working local goods trips. |
SLS/196209 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76020 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
01/12/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953. |
|
|
09/02/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1956. Dep: 14/03/1956. |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
23/12/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Horwich Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/12/1958. Dep: 27/02/1959. |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
06/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
15/03/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Horwich Works (Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1960. Dep: 05/04/1960. |
|
|
23/08/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Horwich Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1960. Dep: 09/09/1960. |
|
|
30/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
|
|
|
28/02/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Horwich Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1962. Dep: 05/04/1962. |
|
|
21/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (21D) |
|
|
30/07/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Horwich Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1962. Dep: 28/08/1962. |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
25/08/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/08/1964. Dep: 05/10/1964. |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
31/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76020 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|