Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 501 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 1366 Week
» 14399 Month
» 236800 Year
» 1121181 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76019 m/e 07/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 07/1953 to Eastleigh (71A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 20/02/1966
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 12 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
71A Eastleigh (New) m/e 07/1953
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 23/08/1961
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 20/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 23/08/1961
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 20/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1953 To Service To service as BR Number 76019
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Eastleigh (71A)
   
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
23/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 76019    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev