Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1215 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20126 Week
» 85080 Month
» 287744 Year
» 3314597 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76012 |
on |
31/03/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
27/06/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/09/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76012 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
12/05/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/05/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. |
|
|
20/09/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 05/10/1956. |
|
|
31/03/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1958. Dep: 02/05/1958. |
|
|
05/05/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 05/05/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960. |
|
|
24/11/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/11/1960. Dep: 10/12/1960. |
|
|
20/11/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 20/11/1961. Dep: 02/12/1961. |
|
|
01/10/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1963. Dep: 16/11/1963. |
|
|
12/04/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 12/04/1965. Dep: 14/04/1965. |
|
|
16/11/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 16/11/1965. Dep: 26/11/1965. |
|
|
27/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
04/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76012 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |
|
|