Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1003 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8010 Week
» 14144 Month
» 242028 Year
» 1463593 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 76005 m/e 12/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1952 to Eastleigh (71A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Birds (Morriston)
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
71A Eastleigh (New) m/e 12/1952
71B Bournemouth 8w/e 20/07/1953
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/10/1953
75A Brighton m/e 01/1954
71C Dorchester 8w/e 13/05/1954
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 11/03/1955
72B Salisbury 6w/e 21/06/1955
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 08/01/1953
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 71C Dorchester 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 11/03/1955
ALLOC 72B Salisbury w/e 21/06/1955
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/01/1954 Southern Miscellany On 18th January the 10.21 a.m. into Victoria from Brighton, via Lewes, Edenbridge, and Oxted, was hauled by 76006, the engine returning on the 12.03 p.m. down to Brighton. The 1.17 p.m. also from Brighton was hauled by 76005, returning on the 3.52 p.m. down. The latter engine bears a date plate, 'Horwich, 1952,' while the former is 'Horwich, 1953.' It is not known if this presumed transfer is permanent. SLS/195402
25/02/1954 Brighton Works New construction includes Main Line Diesel-Electric 10203 (approaching completion), 80079 (due 12/2), 80080 (due 2/3), 80081 (due 17/3), 80082 (due 1/4). Terrier 32661 has been re-painted, also- 30922, 30545. Other repairs include 30929, 30785, 32133, 32506, 30732, 30285, 15202, 15231, 10000 (nearly ready to leave), 32670, 42104, 30053, 30044. Nos. 76005/6 have been performing indifferently from Brighton on the heavy 8.20 a.m. up and 3.52 p.m. down via Eridge. It had been hoped that these engines might be the answer to the problem of the through Uckfield to London services, but their performances so far has been in no way superior to that of the Class 4 tanks. SLS/195404
18/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. SLS/196204
20/01/1963 Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 76005
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Eastleigh (71A)
   
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Dorchester (71C)    
11/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 76005    

prev prev