Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 571 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6355 Week
» 27744 Month
» 147271 Year
» 3174124 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7594 |
03/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25244 |
30/10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
03/06/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
21/07/1986 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
21/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/06/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
21/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
cX |
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
03/06/1964 |
Power Unit VA916 |
|
|
|
03/06/1964 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21176 |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7594 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
21/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
30/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25244 |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
21/07/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25244 |
|
|