Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1582 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19385 Week
» 72401 Month
» 191928 Year
» 3218781 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7590 |
15/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25240 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/09/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/04/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/09/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
15/04/1964 |
Power Unit VA790 |
|
|
|
15/04/1964 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21198 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7590 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
17/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
02/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25240 |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
24/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25240 |
|
|
17/12/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|