Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1587 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14993 Week
» 68009 Month
» 187536 Year
» 3214389 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7576 |
09/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25226 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/11/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7576 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
01/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25226 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
03/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
10/06/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25226 |
|
|
30/09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|