Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3477 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30656 Week
» 21712 Month
» 368136 Year
» 3394989 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7560 |
18/09/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25210 |
19/12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/09/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
10/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/09/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
10/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
10/1978 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7560 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
11/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
19/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25210 |
|
|
10/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
29/04/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25210 |
|
|
03/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|