Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 286 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6070 Week
» 27459 Month
» 146986 Year
» 3173839 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7541 |
29/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25191 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
29/03/1965 to Nottingham Division (D16) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/03/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/03/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7541 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25191 |
|
|
01/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25191 |
|
|