Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 833 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6617 Week
» 28006 Month
» 147533 Year
» 3174386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7535 |
03/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25185 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
03/03/1965 to Nottingham Division (D16) |
Withdrawn |
05/11/1984 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
30/09/1985 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/03/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
02/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/03/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
04/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
02/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7535 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
27/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
18/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25185 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
05/11/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25185 |
|
|
30/09/1985 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|