Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 928 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14334 Week
» 67350 Month
» 186877 Year
» 3213730 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
75068 |
on |
15/09/1955 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
BR1B |
1032 |
15/09/1955 |
BR |
4,725g |
7t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: BR1B number 1032 |
|
|
15/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 75068 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
19/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
02/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 75068 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Risca |
|
|