Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 260 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7267 Week
» 13401 Month
» 241285 Year
» 1462850 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75019 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 391
To Service During 03/1952 to Southport (27C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Scrapping During 11/1968 at Campbells (Airdrie)
Service Life 16 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27C Southport (New) m/e 03/1952
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/12/1963
10G Skipton w/e 20/03/1965
10A Carnforth w/e 21/01/1967
12E Tebay w/e 22/04/1967
10A Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 27C Southport 22/03/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 31/03/1952
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 10G Skipton 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 01/02/1967
ALLOC 12E Tebay 4w/e 06/05/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1952 W.D. Renumbering Details have already been given of the renumbering being, carried out of W.D. locomotives. It has been observed that in some cases the old five-figure number has not been deleted when the new one is applied. Examples of this at Longmoor recently included 400 (77337); 601 (73797) and 1177 (75275), while Diesel No. 891, also carries numbers 71233 and WS378. At Shoeburyness, too, can be seen engines carrying two or three numbers, since in addition to their old and new W.D. numbers, the permanent stock here also carries Shoeburyness Garrison Railway numbers. In June, two such engines were observed, S.G.R. 24 (126, 75099) and 25 (168, 75019), and it is possible that there may be others. Two engines of especial interest are at Longmoor. One is an ex-G.W.R. Dean 0-6-0, nameless and unlettered, but with the number 2501 on the bufferbeam. The other is the former No. 93257 (U.S. Army type 2-8-0), now officially W.D. 700. This is at present not carrying either of its W.D. numbers. It has been used in a film, in which it depicts a Russian engine, and it still carries its 'Russian' number, A$ 7121, on the bufferbeam. There are no lettering or numbers whatever on cab or tender. SLS/195302
01/05/1958 Derby Works (Yard) 1st May. G-General repair, I-Intermediate Repair, L-Lined out. Paint Shop-118 (for cleaning up, fitting motion, etc.), D3509 (new), 12038 I, 44003 G, 44224 I, 44470 I, 48096 G, 47582 G, 73029 GL. Diesel Erecting Shop-E.D.2, D2508 (ex 11147), 10201 casual, 10202 attention to tyres, 12001/95, 13059. New Loco. Construction-D3510 (no. 8) (on test), D3511/2/3/4 (nos. 9, 10, 11, 12), D3515/7 (nos. 13/5) frames set up, D3522/3 (nos. 20/1).- Outside-East end, 11120, ED4 attention to crank pins; West end, 10100 cracked no. 1 AEC auxiliary engine cylinder block; test house, 10203. Erecting Shop no. 1 bay, 40580 G, 40681 G, 41900G, 42349 G, 42452 I, 42540 G, 43913 I, 44605 G, 48362 I, 48510 G, 48772 I, 80047 G, 80050 I; stripping section-42310 G, 48273 G, 48447 I; Erecting Shop no. 2 bay-42527 I, 43885 I, 44416 G, 44534 I; stripping-44561 G; frames only-D3516 (no. 14), D3518/9/20/1 (nos. 16/7/8/9) of Lot D658; Erecting Shop no. 3 bay-(new work, main line diesel) Lot B251, nos. 1-7, (Bo-Bo), (D5000-6). No Sulzer engine finally in position yet. No. 1 (D1 on welding jig), 1-Co-Co-1. Yard-40047, 40447 (submitted for cut-up from Crewe), 40680, 41066 (Exam.), 41086 (cut-up), 41980 (Exam.), 43332 (Exam.), 47004 G, 47218 I, 47290 G, 47488 I, 53800 (waiting cyls.), 73072, 75019. SLS/195805
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005
04/01/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. SLS/196202
16/01/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. SLS/196202
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75019
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Southport (27C)
   
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
21/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 75019    

prev prev