Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 106 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7113 Week
» 13247 Month
» 241131 Year
» 1462696 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75018 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 391
To Service During 03/1952 to Southport (27C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/06/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Buttigiegs (Newport)
Service Life 15 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27C Southport (New) m/e 03/1952
2B Nuneaton w/e 25/05/1963
6H Bangor w/e 22/06/1963
5D Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
5E Nuneaton w/e 30/04/1966
5D Stoke w/e 04/06/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 17/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 27C Southport 08/03/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 31/03/1952
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 07/05/1966
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 11/06/1966
WDN   w/e 17/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/04/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop, No. 1 bay) Paint shop, 40672 G, 44376 G, 44553 G, 47285 I, D3763/4 New. Diesel erecting shop, 10202, 12092, 13085, D2221 (Old no. 11127), D5714, ED4/5. New work, D3765-D3772 0-6-0 D.E. shunters. Test house, D5015. Diesel Loco. finishing shop, D1 Scafell Pike, D5016 New. Erecting shop, No. 1 bay, 42522 G, 44070 I, 44576 G, 47362 G, 47448 I, 47629 I, 48001 G, 48225 I, 48304 I, 48653 G, 73032 G, 75016 I, 75018 G, 75045 G. Stripping, 44569, 48007, 48128. Erecting shop, No. 2 bay 41000 General, new cylinders, two frame inserts over driving horns, 42402 I, 43991 I, 44420 I, 47611 I, 48081 I, 53804 I. Erecting shop, No. 3 bay 7 Bo-Bo D-E. 1160 H.P. (D5017-D5023) 5 1-Co.-Co.-1 D-E. 2300 H.P. (D2-D6). Yard, 40047, 40680, 41165, 42335, 42354, 43292, 43324, 43629, 47309, 48033, 48133, 48186, 48197, 48374, 48380, 48405, 58085, 58308, 73140, 10100, 10800, D3124 Cecil Raikes. Stored, 40925. SLS/195905
19/09/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110
12/10/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D36, D46, D73, D87, D100/31/44/88, D5011/30/79, D5136, 10001. Test House: D75, D5033. Outside Test House: D45, D66, D77, D93/4, D165 (loco. that was turned on its side on strike day), D185, D3056, D5021/75. Outside Shunter Test House: ED6, D2236, D3292. New Building : D184, D190-D193, D5186-5191. Finishing Shop: D38, D186/7, D5142, Pullman uM60091. Erecting Shop: ED7, D55, D123, D189, D2507, D2859, D2908/10, 13304, 42080/96, 44137, 47000, 47319 (being cut-up), 48009, 48214/79/85/6, 73031, 75009/18/54. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42212. Stone Pit: 48718, 58137/63/6. Foundry Row: 42388, 42500, 47554, 73016, 73157. Klondyke Sidings: D84, 44020, 44122/43, 44435, 47588 (last five locos. frames only). Bone Yard: 10201/3. Ex Works on Shed: 42081 (12C), 42100 (5A), 44139 (16A), 44414 (15C), 44420 (17A), 48007 (21A), 48109 (21A), 75037 (1E). Research Dept.: E3030/71/87. SLS/196211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75018
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Southport (27C)
   
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
17/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75018    

prev prev