Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 122 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6098 Week
» 12232 Month
» 240116 Year
» 1461681 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75017 m/e 01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 391
To Service During 01/1952 to Southport (27C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/01/1967
Scrapping During 05/1967 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 15 yrs , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27C Southport (New) m/e 01/1952
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/12/1963
10G Skipton w/e 20/03/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 07/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 27C Southport w/e 19/01/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 31/01/1952
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 10G Skipton 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 07/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/08/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. SLS/195809
16/01/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) Paint shop-42378/81, 43940, 47451/583, 48611. Diesel shop-ED2, 10000/100/800, 12000/035/082, D3020, 13037, D8014. New work-0-6-0 shunters D3763/4; outside-ED7, D5001/2/6. Test House-D5005/7/8. Erecting shop-1 bay-42511I, 42610 G, 44167G, 44338I, 44535G, 44587G, 47000I, 47421I, 48006/217 G, 48370/533G, 75017I. Stripping-48654, 73038, 75035. Erecting shop-2 bay-40035I, 42533G, 42542I, 44277I, 48267I, 53808I, 48317 stripping. Erecting shop-3 bay-7 Bo-Bos (D5009-15new) 1160 H.P., 5 1-Co-Co-ls 2300 H.P. Yard-40047/680/3180/7309, 58209. SLS/195902
19/09/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110
16/10/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Paint Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75017
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Southport (27C)
   
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
07/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75017    

prev prev