Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 29 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6005 Week
» 12139 Month
» 240023 Year
» 1461588 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75016 m/e 01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 391
To Service During 01/1952 to Southport (27C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/07/1967
Scrapping During 06/1968 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 15 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27C Southport (New) m/e 01/1952
2B Nuneaton w/e 25/05/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 19/06/1965
6C Croes Newydd w/e 11/03/1967
16B Colwick (stationary boiler) w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 08/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 27C Southport w/e 05/01/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 31/01/1952
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 16B Colwick 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN   w/e 08/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
14/04/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop, No. 1 bay) Paint shop, 40672 G, 44376 G, 44553 G, 47285 I, D3763/4 New. Diesel erecting shop, 10202, 12092, 13085, D2221 (Old no. 11127), D5714, ED4/5. New work, D3765-D3772 0-6-0 D.E. shunters. Test house, D5015. Diesel Loco. finishing shop, D1 Scafell Pike, D5016 New. Erecting shop, No. 1 bay, 42522 G, 44070 I, 44576 G, 47362 G, 47448 I, 47629 I, 48001 G, 48225 I, 48304 I, 48653 G, 73032 G, 75016 I, 75018 G, 75045 G. Stripping, 44569, 48007, 48128. Erecting shop, No. 2 bay 41000 General, new cylinders, two frame inserts over driving horns, 42402 I, 43991 I, 44420 I, 47611 I, 48081 I, 53804 I. Erecting shop, No. 3 bay 7 Bo-Bo D-E. 1160 H.P. (D5017-D5023) 5 1-Co.-Co.-1 D-E. 2300 H.P. (D2-D6). Yard, 40047, 40680, 41165, 42335, 42354, 43292, 43324, 43629, 47309, 48033, 48133, 48186, 48197, 48374, 48380, 48405, 58085, 58308, 73140, 10100, 10800, D3124 Cecil Raikes. Stored, 40925. SLS/195905
13/03/1961 Derby Works (Ex Works Shed) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. SLS/196104
06/04/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D1, D3, D72, D90, D105, D2506, D2912, D3124, D3859, D5020/2/30/76/86/9/91/2. Test House: D162, D2908, D5029/88, D5136, 10203. New Building: D167-D176. Finishing Shop: D69, D74, D165/6, D5028, D5133. Erecting Shop: D3067/8, D3371, D3585/7, 13117/68/78, 42542, 44243, 44425, 47321, 47534, 48272/82, 48413, 48669/87, 53808, 73140, 75016. Paint Shop: D163 Leicestershire and Derbyshire Yeomanry, D164, M.R. 1000, 42350, Outside : 43982. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D2508, D5137, 12000, 41168, 42332/63/75, 42448, 43263, 43410/64, 43760, 43825, 43938/85, 44092, 44154, 44561/83, 47218/59, 47310/40, 47601, 48094, 'Spike Island' (Gasworks): Cut up remains of 42387, 44166, 47353 an 47516. SLS/196205
07/05/1962 Derby MPD Ex Works on Shed: D2506, D3178, D5082/9, D5137/8, 43865, 43950, 44569, 47485, 47534, 48094, 48282, 48413, 75016. SLS/196206
31/05/1964 Eastleigh Shed (Interesting Locos) Ex Works: D2283, 34079, 75005, 82019. Waiting Works or Scrap: 30029, 30036, 30048, 30052/3, 30102/7/8, 30480, 30512, 30546/8, 30667, 30837, 31626/9, 31797, 31864/8, 32646, 32650, 32662, 34047, 34065/7, 34073, 76028. Interesting Locos: 70017 (5A) Failed, 75016 (5E), 4951 (81F). SLS/196407
08/05/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 45025/39/145/198, 45375, 48620, 75016, 92009/110/60, D1100-7, D1557/60, D1709/11/21/2/42/7/52, D203, D253/4, D279, D317/21/5/41, E5016; Paint shop: 45294, 45455, 70010/22, 46235, 71000 stored, D1635, D1996/8/9, D5232, D5709; Electric and adjacent shop: D221, D257, D276, D1507/12, D1844/8, D5196, D5223/9/33, D5243, D7582, E3031/7/42/67, 26021; Old cutting up shop: E3045, D1534/75, D1889, D5704, D8045; Side of Works: 45395, 92048/163, D5702/10; Traverser area: D310/20/37/55/79, D1515/90, D1603/6, D1708/14/8, D1897, D1997, 26048, 92052. SLS/196606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75016
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Southport (27C)
   
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B) (stationary boiler)    
08/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75016    

prev prev